NORTHAMPTON ABINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1151292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bob Leathersich Trustee 16 December 2014 None on record
Maria Clodoalda Heath Trustee 15 August 2018 None on record
Gwenne Lynell Lewis Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
TONY SKINNER Trustee 14 March 2013 None on record
MARTIN THOMAS SAWYER Trustee 16 February 2017
UNITY LEISURE Received: On time
Aleksandra Kreicberga Trustee 13 September 2016 None on record