HARINGEY MIGRANT SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity number: 1152227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £87.83k £79.50k £190.58k £136.55k £213.88k
Total expenditure £61.21k £84.28k £141.33k £166.65k £181.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A