Trustees CARING IN BRISTOL
Charity number: 1151645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Felicity Clark | Chair | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allan Freeman | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bejide Kafele | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Parry | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Neil Morrison | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Williams | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Strong | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Eldred | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.