WAKEFIELD THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 503597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.11m £2.41m £2.09m £2.14m £1.19m
Total expenditure £2.01m £1.89m £1.97m £2.09m £823.67k
Income from government contracts £100.00k £100.00k £75.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £253.20k £75.00k £70.00k £585.02k
Income - Donations and legacies £292.06k £616.60k £189.14k £186.12k £976.09k
Income - Other trading activities £343.58k £329.86k £411.97k £376.60k £213.86k
Income - Charitable activities £1.47m £1.46m £1.49m £1.58m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £299 £577 £307 £488 £203
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.85m £1.72m £1.77m £1.89m £727.07k
Expenditure - Raising funds £159.02k £169.14k £199.44k £205.64k £96.61k
Expenditure - Governance £12.46k £9.84k £10.61k £10.40k £5.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0