HANGLETON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1151567
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 30/03/2018 30/03/2019 30/03/2020
Total gross income £69.89k £80.08k £91.86k £86.52k £77.32k
Total expenditure £77.01k £80.16k £82.45k £94.58k £92.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £8.00k £5.00k £9.00k