HANGLETON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1151567
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 30 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download