Financial history THE ARTS EMERGENCY SERVICE

Charity number: 1152377
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £161.42k £200.12k £336.09k £444.38k £523.91k
Total expenditure £118.64k £143.36k £231.66k £358.84k £416.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £431.25k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £44.61k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £128
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £47.93k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £416.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £18.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0