Trustees THE ARTS EMERGENCY SERVICE

Charity number: 1152377
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHAUN GLANVILLE Chair 20 March 2013
None on record
Alexandra Keramidas Trustee 16 November 2021
CITY HEARTS (UK)
Received: On time
Evangeline Oluyomi Adegoke Trustee 06 June 2020
None on record
Khanyisile Jameelah Aqiyla Edwards Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
Julian James Burke Trustee 12 January 2017
None on record
Felicity Woodrow Trustee 23 November 2016
None on record
EMILIE TAPPING Trustee 21 October 2016
None on record
DAVID STEWART Trustee 20 March 2013
None on record