Financial history ST MARY'S RC SCHOOL DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity number: 1153841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £26.74k £18.50k £19.15k £30.20k £17.14k
Total expenditure £28.35k £13.28k £20.68k £22.42k £5.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A