Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S RC SCHOOL DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity number: 1153841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 July 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 31 July 2021 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 July 2018 11 days late Download Open in new window