THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST AND ST LUKE THE EVANGELIST, CLAY HILL, ENFIELD

Charity number: 1151418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £150.37k £135.54k £163.33k £139.45k £136.14k
Total expenditure £118.12k £145.42k £117.46k £162.63k £145.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £740 £764 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A