THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST AND ST LUKE THE EVANGELIST, CLAY HILL, ENFIELD

Charity number: 1151418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Doreen Addy Trustee 02 May 2021 None on record
PAUL BATES Chair 24 March 2013 None on record
John Rhatigan Trustee 16 May 2019 None on record
ELAINE ANN PLUMB Trustee 24 March 2013 None on record
PETER LIVERMORE Trustee 15 March 2015
ALL PEOPLE ALL PLACES Received: On time
MICHAEL ANTHONY MANSFIELD Trustee 24 March 2013 None on record
Jack Williams Trustee 01 March 2020 None on record
Heather Muriel Ogilvy Livermore Trustee 02 May 2021 None on record
MARY LESLEY ENGLEFIELD Trustee 24 March 2013 None on record
Gillian A Medcalf Trustee 16 March 2014 None on record
CHERYL GRAHAM Trustee 24 March 2013 None on record
ANDREW DENNIS REID Trustee 24 March 2013 None on record
Anita Wyatt Trustee 04 May 2021 None on record
Marion Margaret Berry Trustee 06 March 2016 None on record
IAN JAMES BUSWELL Trustee 24 March 2013 None on record
Dr JOHN SIDNEY WRIGHT Trustee 24 March 2013 None on record
Sarah Rebecca Smith Trustee 02 May 2021 None on record