Financial history THE NINA LOUISE SPREADBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1151729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/09/2017 15/09/2018 15/09/2019 15/09/2020 15/09/2021
Total gross income £13.20k £12.64k £12.15k £5.15k £4.65k
Total expenditure £13.16k £12.45k £12.85k £12.17k £9.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A