Accounts and annual returns EDEN NETWORK MERSEYSIDE

Charity number: 1152765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 February 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 February 2021 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 May 2019 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 May 2019 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 October 2018 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 October 2018 266 days late Download Open in new window