Financial history EDEN NETWORK MERSEYSIDE

Charity number: 1152765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.72k £5.52k £2.35k £1.85k £1.85k
Total expenditure £5.38k £6.25k £1.01k £585 £732
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A