EALING SOUP KITCHEN

Charity number: 1152247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £29.94k £49.17k £30.74k £70.78k £96.97k
Total expenditure £28.75k £30.22k £45.40k £31.65k £47.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A