AL-MADINA ISLAMIC & CULTURAL CENTRE SURBITON

Charity number: 1157559
Charity reporting is up to date (230 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 September 2021 230 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 September 2021 230 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 September 2021 596 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 20 September 2021 958 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 20 September 2021 958 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 May 2019 478 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 29 May 2019 843 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required