901 TROOP MARINE CADETS

Charity number: 1153100
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020
Total gross income £19.72k £26.27k £18.45k £24.19k £28.69k
Total expenditure £16.01k £23.86k £22.51k £20.85k £19.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k N/A N/A N/A