WHICKHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1152975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £27.15k £28.66k £26.56k £28.12k £37.86k
Total expenditure £23.14k £30.90k £32.33k £34.71k £32.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £12.97k