Financial history FORMA ARTS AND MEDIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1152156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £380.30k £479.81k £265.48k £336.37k £409.26k
Total expenditure £422.68k £433.78k £279.92k £242.48k £351.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £12.20k N/A
Income from government grants £259.68k £388.83k N/A N/A N/A