Financial history WESTWAY OPEN ARMS

Charity number: 1153919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30.53k £31.45k £18.94k £21.68k £67.84k
Total expenditure £13.49k £23.92k £22.29k £20.71k £21.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.18k £7.44k £2.00k N/A £500