Financial history NEW LIFE SUPPORT

Charity number: 1156235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £81.69k £81.48k £77.08k £44.81k £63.41k
Total expenditure £85.63k £81.61k £66.33k £49.51k £57.33k
Income from government contracts £35.82k £1 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.43k £17.59k N/A N/A £2.00k