Financial history LONDON SCHOOL OF SUPERNATURAL MINISTRY

Charity number: 1152393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £110.83k £167.96k £90.85k £23.64k £39.96k
Total expenditure £119.50k £139.43k £122.46k £24.87k £40.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A