LANGNEY VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1152969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £16.90k £33.94k £37.93k £28.31k £31.50k
Total expenditure £13.48k £22.18k £38.17k £28.88k £60.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.00k £0 £3.06k £10.00k