PUDSEY WELLBEING CHARITY

Charity number: 1153331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £93.54k £88.64k £91.38k £105.90k £102.50k
Total expenditure £85.84k £98.09k £86.53k £103.72k £71.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.07k £6.95k £2.67k £4.56k £51.75k