ASR COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1155055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 August 2019 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 29 August 2019 30 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 24 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 22 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 22 December 2016 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 23 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 23 June 2016 On time Download