ASR COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1155055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £37.96k £49.82k £25.18k £79.08k £11.57k
Total expenditure £38.97k £47.12k £24.70k £45.71k £25.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £13.46k £22.68k £52.70k N/A