THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S BROADWATER

Charity number: 1152921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 07 May 2016 On time Download