THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S BROADWATER

Charity number: 1152921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David James Owen Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Louise Jane Sime Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
HELEN ELIZABETH HENRY Trustee 17 July 2013 None on record
Wendy Susan Hills Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
OBI CHIDZIE ENELI Trustee 11 July 2013 None on record
Mrs Sue Dungey MBE Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
MAURICE RAYMOND GORDON Trustee 07 April 2019
WATTON-AT-STONE SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB Received: On time
Linda Susan Smith Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Gill Gibbs Trustee 06 April 2014 None on record
JILL ADAM Trustee 11 July 2013 None on record
Rev Kate Sharples Chair 27 February 2017 None on record
Wayne Campbell Sime Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
GORDON CHARLES MCDOWELL BAILLIE Trustee 11 July 2013 None on record
RICHARD JOHN BROOKS Trustee 11 July 2013 None on record