Financial history SAFE SOUTH WEST

Charity number: 1153179
Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £16.33k £39.20k £14.72k £49.36k £5.15k
Total expenditure £30.55k £52.50k £21.46k £30.13k £18.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £22.40k £9.55k £2.67k N/A