Accounts and annual returns SAFE SOUTH WEST

Charity number: 1153179
Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 73 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 73 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 February 2024 393 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 February 2024 393 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 May 2023 463 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 May 2023 463 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window