Accounts and annual returns CURDRIDGE READING ROOM AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1153056
Charity reporting is overdue by 233 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 March 2022 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 March 2022 151 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window