Financial history CURDRIDGE READING ROOM AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1153056
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £40.84k £80.75k £99.02k £31.41k £24.68k
Total expenditure £50.61k £79.01k £81.60k £39.71k £42.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A £3.89k £6.00k N/A