WOMBWELL MAIN COMMUNITY AND SPORTING ASSOCIATION C.I.O

Charity number: 1153248
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time Download