WOMBWELL MAIN COMMUNITY AND SPORTING ASSOCIATION C.I.O

Charity number: 1153248
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £250.52k £304.36k £264.50k £287.64k £288.88k
Total expenditure £227.32k £207.88k £236.48k £289.67k £257.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £10.78k £12.04k £35.45k