Financial history BRIGHT SIGHT MISSION

Charity number: 1154486
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/09/2016 20/09/2017 20/09/2018 20/09/2019 20/09/2020
Total gross income £6.30k £12.00k £16.95k £7.24k £16.30k
Total expenditure £14.18k £2.18k £22.93k £4.12k £25.11k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A