Accounts and annual returns THE SERSE TRUST

Charity number: 1153972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window