BACKWELL LIFE

Charity number: 1155047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £4.29k £5.89k £4.77k £4.96k £2.83k
Total expenditure £3.68k £4.41k £5.20k £4.09k £2.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £250 £400
Income from government grants £500 £500 £500 £500 £500