BACKWELL LIFE

Charity number: 1155047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 24 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 09 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 16 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 16 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 10 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 23 October 2017 On time Download