Financial history GERALDINE CONNOR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156982
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £133.54k £121.25k £91.05k £84.69k £140.57k
Total expenditure £102.22k £146.87k £112.49k £104.98k £104.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £59.30k £35.15k £11.95k £19.07k