WHITCHURCH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1153274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £5.20k £7.63k £9.69k £14.90k £34.89k
Total expenditure £5.94k £5.52k £7.58k £8.18k £21.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.00k