Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS AND SUPPORTERS OF ST OWENS CENTRE

Charity number: 503924
Charity reporting is overdue by 170 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 170 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 170 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required