Financial history FRIENDS AND SUPPORTERS OF ST OWENS CENTRE

Charity number: 503924
Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.30k £2.07k £3.63k £485 £0
Total expenditure £7.82k £3.32k £7.01k £721 £1.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A