FRIENDS OF PIONEER

Charity number: 1153165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 April 2021 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 April 2021 647 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 September 2018 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required