FRIENDS OF PIONEER

Charity number: 1153165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.41k £5.09k £13.72k £2.13k £11.13k
Total expenditure £2.57k £5.41k £9.54k £6.06k £6.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A