Financial history THE PRINCESS PROJECT

Charity number: 1155021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £43.22k £49.37k £78.70k £106.65k £101.17k
Total expenditure £38.71k £44.46k £59.99k £88.63k £85.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £20.95k £15.22k