Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST CLEMENT, OUTWELL

Charity number: 1153335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required