Financial history FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST CLEMENT, OUTWELL

Charity number: 1153335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £4.55k £16.35k £19.00k £4.40k £725
Total expenditure £1.29k £16.92k £13.60k £19.26k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A