HARTLEPOOL AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1153641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wendy Borthwick Trustee 06 April 2018 None on record
Edwina Atkinson Trustee 31 May 2019 None on record
Keith Alder Trustee 29 September 2019 None on record
Jessica Scott Trustee 07 June 2017 None on record
Linda Sargent Trustee 06 April 2018 None on record
Philip Jefferies Trustee 30 June 2017 None on record
Christopher McLoughlin Trustee 07 June 2017 None on record
Roger Say Trustee 07 June 2017 None on record
Patricia Anne Tarbitt Trustee 30 June 2017 None on record