POOLE AFRICA LINK

Charity number: 1153530
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £26.80k £19.00k £18.96k £21.20k £27.25k
Total expenditure £22.90k £29.55k £31.60k £37.50k £37.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A